DC B22-0522 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes the District Waterways Management Office within the Office of the City Administrator and also establishes the District Waterways Management Commission. The Office's purpose will be to plan, manage, coordinate, promote, and advocate for the diverse uses of and access to the waterways and adjacent property. The Commission is required to develop and publish a District Waterways Management Action Plan by July 1, 2019.
Title
District Waterways Management Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0522 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2017-10-17 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0522 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39025/B22-0522-Introduction.pdf |