DC B22-0514 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes a judicial review process for firearm applicants who have been found to be incapacitated or committed to a mental hospital, institution, or facility by the Superior Court of the District of Columbia or a District board, commission or lawful authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief From Firearms Disqualification Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-03CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-10-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-10-13CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0514 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-03CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback