DC B22-0505 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes a new program in the Department of Housing and Community Development (DHCD), the Reverse Mortgage Foreclosure Prevention Program. The program will provide financial assistance in the form of a zero interest loan to seniors who meet the eligibility requirements. The max amount that can be provided to a single homeowner over a five year period is $50,000.
Title
Reverse Mortgage Foreclosure Prevention Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0505 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0505 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38913/B22-0505-Introduction.pdf |