DC B22-0501 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Law Number L22-0146 Effective from July 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes a rebate for District home owners who purchase and install a home composting system and fulfill other obligations of the District's Home Composting Incentive Program. Rebates are contingent on the availability of funds. FUNDING NOTE - This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Composting Incentives Amendment Act Of 2017 (now Known As "home Composting Incentives Amendment Act Of 2018")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-17CouncilLaw Number L22-0146 Effective from July 17, 2018
2018-06-04CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-06-01CouncilAct A22-0373 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5984
2018-05-21CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0373
2018-05-21CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0373
2018-05-11CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2018
2018-05-01CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-04-10CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-03-29CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-03-29CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0501
2017-12-07CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-10-06CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0501 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-03CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2017-10-03CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback