DC B22-0495 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Law Number L22-0043 Effective from January 17, 2018, Expires on August 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is January 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Law Number L22-0043 Effective from January 17, 2018, Expires on August 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is January 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Board Of Directors Appointment Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Board Of Directors Appointment Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Council | Law Number L22-0043 Effective from January 17, 2018, Expires on August 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is January 12, 2018 |
2017-12-01 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is January 12, 2018 |
2017-12-01 | Council | Act A22-0189 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12310 |
2017-11-29 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0189 |
2017-11-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 28, 2017 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-10-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0495 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-03 | Council | First Reading |
2017-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |