DC B22-0475 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Act A22-0156, Expires on January 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10764
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Act A22-0156, Expires on January 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10764
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Huron Consulting Services, LLC
Title
Contract No. Cw51849 And Modification To Contract No. Cw51849 With Huron Consulting Services, Llc Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | Council | Act A22-0156, Expires on January 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10764 |
2017-10-23 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0156 |
2017-10-23 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0156 |
2017-10-06 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 23, 2017 |
2017-10-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-10-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-09-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |