DC B22-0471 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Law Number L22-0038 Effective from January 17, 2018, Expires on August 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dining With Dogs Temporary Act Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dining With Dogs Temporary Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Council - Amendments (Gray) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26CouncilLaw Number L22-0038 Effective from January 17, 2018, Expires on August 30, 2018
2017-12-01CouncilAct A22-0184 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12300
2017-12-01CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2017-11-22CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0184
2017-11-22CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0184
2017-11-13CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 28, 2017
2017-11-07CouncilFinal Reading CC
2017-10-06CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0471 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-03CouncilFirst Reading
2017-10-03CouncilAmendments (Gray)
2017-10-03CouncilRetained by the Council
2017-09-28CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback