DC B22-0467 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes under what circumstances a notarial act is voidable. It establishes requirements for certain notarial acts. It establishes requirements for proof of identification of an individual seeking notary services. It establishes under what conditions a notarial officer may refuse to perform a notarial act. It identifies who other than a notary public may perform a notarial act. It addresses how notarial acts performed in other states are treated in the District. It facilitates the use of electronic records. Among other things, it prohibits certain fraudulent practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revised Uniform Law On Notarial Acts Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-12CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-10-06CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0467 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-03CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2017-09-25CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback