DC B22-0461 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill would require any housing provider to transmit a copy of any notice to vacate to the Office of the Tenant Advocate within two days after the notice is served on the tenant. After receiving the notice from the housing provider, the Office of the Tenant Advocate must send the following items to the tenant within four days of receipt: (1) notice of basic housing rights and resources; (2) a list of tenants' rights organizations with their contact information; (3) a list of organizations that provide rental payment assistance; (4) a list of organizations that provide legal advice for tenants facing eviction.
Title
Eviction Prevention Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-08-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-08-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0461 Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0461 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38777/B22-0461-Introduction.pdf |