DC B22-0458 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires the Metropolitan Police Department (MPD) to provide opioid rescue kits, for those that qualify, to prevent potential overdose deaths. The rescue kits include overdose education materials that conform to specific guidelines for overdose education that explain the signs and causes of an opioid overdose and instructions on when and how to administer life-saving rescue techniques. MPD is required to train qualified personnel and allow for voluntary surrender of opiates and drug paraphernalia at MPD stations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid Overdose Prevention Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-12CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-10-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-10-13CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-09-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0458 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-09-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback