DC B22-0447 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill amends current laws regarding sealing and expungement of criminal records by allowing for automatic sealing and expungement of certain cases. It identifies which misdemeanors and felonies qualify for sealing or expungement. It establishes procedures for the Clerk of the Court, prosecutors, law enforcement agency, pretrial corrections, and the community supervision agency regarding expungement for non-convictions and for those arrested, confined, and released without being charged.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Record Sealing Modernization Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-14CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-09-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0447 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-09-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback