DC B22-0437 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires that beginning on January 1, 2020, all new or substantially residential buildings with 4 or fewer dwelling units shall include solar-ready zones, possess sufficient roof load capacity to hold a solar system, and include clear pathways for routing electric conduits or plumbing from the solar-ready zone to the electrical service panel or hot water system. Similarly, new or substantially renovated commercial properties with 5 or more dwelling units must include an on-site renewable energy system capable of generating at least 10% of the building's energy needs. The bill specifies that the Mayor may exempt buildings in either category, and that a building may receive an exemption without a determination from the Mayor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar Ready Roofs And Sustainable Development Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-13CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-09-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0437 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2017-09-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback