DC B22-0431 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0105 Effective from June 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill makes technical amendments to the Retail Incentive Act of 2004 to centralize and consolidate resolutions and acts that pertain to the Great Streets Program. It clarifies the boundaries of the existing Great Streets corridors and updates the date of authority to issue funds under the H Street Retail Priority Grant Fund, among other things.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Great Streets Technical Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22CouncilLaw Number L22-0105 Effective from June 5, 2018
2018-04-23CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-04-13CouncilAct A22-0306 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3784
2018-04-04CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0306
2018-04-04CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0306
2018-03-23CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 6, 2018
2018-03-06CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-02-06CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-01-17CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-01-17CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0431
2017-12-11CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-12-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-09-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0431 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2017-09-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback