DC B22-0429 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Act A22-0144, Expires on January 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Act A22-0144, Expires on January 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Obligation Bonds And Bond Anticipation Notes For Fiscal Years 2018-2023 Emergency Act Of 2017
Title
General Obligation Bonds And Bond Anticipation Notes For Fiscal Years 2018-2023 Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Council | Act A22-0144, Expires on January 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10172 |
2017-10-04 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0144 |
2017-10-04 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0144 |
2017-09-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 6, 2017 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-09-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |