DC B22-0424 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0110 Effective from June 5, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0110 Effective from June 5, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill amends the Nurse Staffing Agency Act of 2003 to clarify the Department of Health does not require a nurse staffing agency license for businesses that only offer an employee nurse staffing registry. It preserves the status of businesses that operate in the District without a nurse staffing agency license that offer only a hiring registry.
Title
Nurse Staffing Agency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Council | Law Number L22-0110 Effective from June 5, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Council | Act A22-0314 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3826 |
2018-04-06 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0314 |
2018-04-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0314 |
2018-03-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 11, 2019 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-02-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-01-17 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-01-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0424 |
2017-11-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0424 Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |