DC B22-0423 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes the issuance of Parks and Recreation motor vehicle identification tags, sets fees for application and display fees for the tags, and specifies that funds obtained shall be deposited in the Recreation Enterprise Fund.
Provisions incorporated into Bill 22-500.
Title
Parks And Recreation License Plate Establishment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0423 Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0423 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38702/B22-0423-Introduction.pdf |