DC B22-0420 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0123 Effective from July 3, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill authorizes the Captive Insurance Agency to procure certain policies of insurance, and clarifies that the bill does not limit or waive the District's sovereign immunity or common-law defenses to litigation or claims that may be covered by insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Captive Insurance Agency Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10CouncilLaw Number L22-0123 Effective from July 3, 2018
2018-05-21CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-05-11CouncilAct A22-0342 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5088
2018-05-07CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0342
2018-05-07CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0342
2018-04-24CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 8, 2018
2018-04-10CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-03-06CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-02-14CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-02-07CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0420
2017-12-11CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-09-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0420 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2017-09-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback