DC B22-0419 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Law Number L22-0122 Effective from July 3, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes a fund, the Subrogation Fund. The fund would be administered by the Chief Risk Officer and would be used for expenses relating to the repair and replacement of damaged or destroyed District property. Revenue from appropriations and subrogation claims bought by the Office of the Attorney General will be deposited into the Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subrogation Fund Establishment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03CouncilLaw Number L22-0122 Effective from July 3, 2018
2018-05-21CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-05-11CouncilAct A22-0341 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5086
2018-05-07CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0341
2018-05-07CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0341
2018-04-24CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 8, 2018
2018-04-10CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-03-06CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-02-14CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-02-07CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0419
2017-12-11CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-09-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0419 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2017-09-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback