DC B22-0416 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Law Number L22-0032 Effective from December 7, 2017, Expires on July 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public School Nurse Assignment Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Nurse Assignment Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07CouncilLaw Number L22-0032 Effective from December 7, 2017, Expires on July 20, 2018
2017-10-27CouncilAct A22-0151 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10738
2017-10-24CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2017-10-18CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0151
2017-10-18CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0151
2017-10-04CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 19, 2017
2017-10-03CouncilFinal Reading CC
2017-09-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0416 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilFirst Reading
2017-09-19CouncilRetained by the Council
2017-09-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback