DC B22-0413 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-20 - Act A22-0146, Expires on January 8, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10443
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-20 - Act A22-0146, Expires on January 8, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10443
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Access To Emergency Epinephrine In Schools Clarification Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Access To Emergency Epinephrine In Schools Clarification Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-20 | Council | Act A22-0146, Expires on January 8, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10443 |
2017-10-10 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0146 |
2017-10-10 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0146 |
2017-09-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 13, 2017 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-09-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |