DC B22-0412 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0145 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0145 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill closes a public alley in Ward 7. The alley is in Square 5196, at the intersection of Nannie Helen Burroughs Avenue and Division Avenue Northeast.
Title
Closing Of A Public Alley In Square 5196, S.o. 17-05785, Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0145 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-01 | Council | Act A22-0372 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5982 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0372 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0372 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-05-01 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2018-04-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0412 |
2018-03-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-02-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-01-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0412 Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |