DC B22-0411 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced this bill gives the Department of Parks and Recreation (DPR) the authority to enter into an agreement with a Business Improvement District (BID) for the maintenance of parks within the BIDs boundaries, to enter into contracts with third parties to generate revenue for maintenance, and for DPR to provide grants to BID corporations for the maintenance and operation of District parks.
Title
Dpr Parks Adoption And Sponsorship Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-02-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0411 Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2017-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0411 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38593/B22-0411-Introduction.pdf |