DC B22-0406 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-05 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-05 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill designates the Therapeutic Recreation Center located at 3030 G Street, S.E. as the Joy Evans Therapeutic Recreation Center.
Title
Joy Evans Therapeutic Recreation Center Designation Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0406 Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0406 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38588/B22-0406-Introduction.pdf |