DC B22-0396 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-09 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-09 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill defines the term property manager and clarifies the scope of duties of licensed property managers in the District. It specifies the education requirements that must be met prior to licensing, inclusive of coursework on common interest communities.
Title
Property Manager Licensing Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0396 Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0396 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38577/B22-0396-Introduction.pdf |