DC B22-0392 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Standard Of Care For Animals Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Standard Of Care For Animals Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Amendment #2 (Todd) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Council - Amendment #1 (Todd) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Council - Amendment #1 (Todd) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-08-11 | Council | Act A22-0137, Expires on October 29, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7787 |
2017-07-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0137 |
2017-07-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0137 |
2017-07-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 2, 2017 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-07-11 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Gray) |
2017-07-11 | Council | Amendment #2 (Todd) |
2017-07-11 | Council | Amendment #1 (Todd) |
2017-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |