DC B22-0390 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Voter Rolls Protection Emergency Act Of 2017
Title
Voter Rolls Protection Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-08-04 | Council | Act A22-0108, Expires on October 23, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7392 |
2017-07-25 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0108 |
2017-07-25 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0108 |
2017-07-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 27, 2017 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |