DC B22-0381 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-09 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-09 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes the Mayor or Mayor's designee to compel the production of ownership records by subpoena after a finding of ten housing code violations in a single housing unit or thirty-five violations in a single building.
Provisions of this bill have been incorporated in Bill 22-317.
Title
Landlord Transparency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0381 Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-07-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0381 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38554/B22-0381-Introduction.pdf |