DC B22-0379 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Act A22-0106, Expires on October 22, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7388
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Act A22-0106, Expires on October 22, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7388
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Primary Date Alteration Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Primary Date Alteration Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-04 | Council | Act A22-0106, Expires on October 22, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7388 |
2017-07-25 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0106 |
2017-07-25 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0106 |
2017-07-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 27, 2017 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-07-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-07-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |