DC B22-0378 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill authorizes tax abatements as incentive for the conversion of office space into residential space in the Golden Triangle and Downtown BID areas. It also requires the Mixed Use Neighborhood Advisory Board to issue a report six months after the legislation is signed by the Mayor on the progress of this act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mixed Use Neighborhood Conversion Incentive Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-20CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-09-29CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-07-14CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0378 Published in the DC Register
2017-07-11CouncilReferred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
2017-07-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback