DC B22-0371 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Act A22-0135, Expires on October 29, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7783
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Act A22-0135, Expires on October 29, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7783
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Tamah, LLC
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Gaga-2015-c-0034 With Tamah, Llc Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Council | Act A22-0135, Expires on October 29, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7783 |
2017-07-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0135 |
2017-07-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0135 |
2017-07-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 2, 2017 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-07-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-06-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |