DC B22-0368 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill exempts certain properties from real property taxation for as long as the property is owned by Washington Parks and People, and is used as a park by the general public, a community garden, or as a children's playground, and is not used for commercial purposes.
Title
Washington Parks & People Equitable Real Property Tax Relief Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-09-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2017-07-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0368 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0368 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38464/B22-0368-Introduction.pdf |