DC B22-0355 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes an Office on Early Childhood Development as well as an Infant and Toddler Educator Task Force; expands the duties of the Early Childhood Development Coordinating Council; and permits the Mayor to provide property tax, sales tax, license fee, and other financial incentives to qualified child development facilities.
Title
Bolstering Early Growth Investment Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-09-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0355 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-27 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0355 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38435/B22-0355-Introduction.pdf |