DC B22-0353 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0104 Effective from June 5, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0104 Effective from June 5, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-104 requires that companies providing utility services to assisted living residences, community residence facilities, and nursing facilities implement a third party notification system and it requires the aforementioned facilities to enroll in the third party notification program and designate a District agency as a third party contact. The third party contact must be authorized to receive duplicate notification of any past-due bill or termination of service sent to the residence or facility and also provide a copy to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman.
Title
Community Residential Facilities Third-party Notice Of Utility Disconnection Requirement Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Council | Law Number L22-0104 Effective from June 5, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Council | Act A22-0305 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3780 |
2018-04-04 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0305 |
2018-04-04 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0305 |
2018-03-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 5, 2018 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-02-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-01-17 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-01-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0353 |
2017-10-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-09-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0353 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-27 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2017-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |