DC B22-0350 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires that the Deputy Mayor for Health and Human Services conduct a feasibility study to assess the ability of a pay-for-success model to improve, expand, and sustain home visiting programs. It establishes a special fund which shall be used to award grants and make payments due in accordance with pay-for-success contracts. Among other things, it requires annual reporting on home visiting services and it establishes the Help Me Grow program District-wide.
Title
Home Visiting Services Pilot Program Establishment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0350 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-27 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0350 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38430/B22-0350-Introduction.pdf |