DC B22-0346 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-05 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-05 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill provides that the Council of the District of Columbia may sponsor a commemorative work on public space and proposes a statue of Charles Hamilton Houston be commissioned. It also requires the Commemorative Works Committee to give a priority to applications for works that are significant to the District's culture or history and that the first priority be such works that honor a woman or individual of a minority who is a native Washingtonian.
Title
Charles Hamilton Houston And Other Diverse Washingtonians Commemorative Works Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0346 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-27 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0346 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38426/B22-0346-Introduction.pdf |