DC B22-0343 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Law Number L22-0019 Effective from September 20, 2017, Expires on May 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is September 19, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Law Number L22-0019 Effective from September 20, 2017, Expires on May 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is September 19, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission On The Arts And Humanities Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Commission On The Arts And Humanities Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-29 | Council | Law Number L22-0019 Effective from September 20, 2017, Expires on May 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is September 19, 2017 |
2017-08-08 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is September 19, 2017 |
2017-08-04 | Council | Act A22-0123 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7422 |
2017-07-28 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0123 |
2017-07-28 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0123 |
2017-07-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 1, 2017 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-07-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-06-30 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0343 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-27 | Council | First Reading |
2017-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |