DC B22-0341 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Act A22-0104, Expires on October 18, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7032
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Act A22-0104, Expires on October 18, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7032
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Emergency Act Of 2017
Title
Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment #1 (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment #2 (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment #2 (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | Council | Act A22-0104, Expires on October 18, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7032 |
2017-07-20 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0104 |
2017-07-20 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0104 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-07-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 21, 2017 |
2017-06-27 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-06-27 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) |
2017-06-27 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2017-06-27 | Council | Amendment #2 (Gray) |
2017-06-27 | Council | Amendment #1 (Gray) |
2017-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |