DC B22-0336 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0069 Effective from March 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 24, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0069 Effective from March 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 24, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-69 designates the alley bounded by the 200 blocks of 2nd and 3rd Streets S.E., and the 200 blocks of C Street and Pennsylvania Avenue, S.E., in Ward 6, as Lincoln Court.
Title
Lincoln Court Designation Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Council | Law Number L22-0069 Effective from March 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 24, 2018 |
2018-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 24, 2018 |
2017-12-29 | Council | Act A22-0217 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13440 |
2017-12-20 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0217 |
2017-12-20 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0217 |
2017-12-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 26, 2017 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-11-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0336 |
2017-11-07 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-09-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-27 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-06-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0336 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |