DC B22-0333 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0060 Effective from February 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0060 Effective from February 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-60 enables advanced practice registered nurses to sign, certify, stamp, or endorse all documents related to healthcare within their scope of practice.
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Signature Authority Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Council | Law Number L22-0060 Effective from February 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018 |
2018-01-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018 |
2018-01-05 | Council | Act A22-0220 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5 |
2017-12-28 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0220 |
2017-12-28 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0220 |
2017-12-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 26, 2017 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-11-07 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-10-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-10-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0333 |
2017-09-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0333 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-06-20 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |