DC B22-0328 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0144 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0144 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill orders the closing of the public alley bounded by 3rd Street N.E., M Street N.E., 2nd Street N.E., and Delaware Avenue N.E., in Ward 6.
Title
Closing Of A Public Alley In Square 748, S.o. 16-21105, Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0144 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-01 | Council | Act A22-0371 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5980 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0371 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0371 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-02-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0328 |
2018-02-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-01-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0328 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-06-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |