DC B22-0325 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires that a covered employee under the Universal Paid Leave Act pay a fee into the Universal Paid Leave implementation Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-08-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-06-20CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2017-06-16CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0325 Published in the DC Register
2017-06-07CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback