DC B22-0316 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes the Mayor to solicit proposals and rank recipients for the expenditure of uncommitted tax revenues one fiscal year before the revenues are available, with the limitation that no contracts, obligations, or commitments may be made until the fiscal year in which the funds are available.
Title
Housing Production Trust Fund Advanced Solicitations Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-08-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0316 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-06-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0316 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38264/B22-0316-Introduction.pdf |