DC B22-0305 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Law Number L22-0018 Effective from September 6, 2017, Expires on April 19, 2018, Projected Law Date is September 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Law Number L22-0018 Effective from September 6, 2017, Expires on April 19, 2018, Projected Law Date is September 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana Certified Business Enterprise Preference Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Medical Marijuana Certified Business Enterprise Preference Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-22 | Council | Law Number L22-0018 Effective from September 6, 2017, Expires on April 19, 2018, Projected Law Date is September 5, 2017 |
2017-07-25 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is September 5, 2017 |
2017-07-21 | Council | Act A22-0101 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6715 |
2017-07-13 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0101 |
2017-07-13 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0101 |
2017-07-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 21, 2017 |
2017-06-27 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-06-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0305 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-06 | Council | First Reading |
2017-06-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-06-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |