DC B22-0302 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires that District employers required to pay unemployment insurance if necessary and with 25 or more employees must provide paid-leave compensation to their employees. It establishes an appeals process as well as penalties for non-compliance or retaliation. It establishes a hardship exemption for those employers that are financially or operationally unable to provide paid leave compensation. Among other things, it requires the Mayor to conduct a study regarding the expansion of paid-leave compensation to District residents that work outside of the District or who may be currently ineligible.
Title
Large Employer Paid-leave Compensation Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0302 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0302 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38227/B22-0302-Introduction.pdf |