DC B22-0288 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As required, this bill requires that complainants to the Office of Human Rights or Commission on Human Rights must be notified of their right to bring a civil action in any court of competent jurisdiction regardless of any Office of Human Rights or Commission on Human Rights proceedings or findings.
Title
Human Rights Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-09-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0288 Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-05-16 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0288 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38125/B22-0288-Introduction.pdf |