DC B22-0287 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0099 Effective from June 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes under what circumstances members of the MPD who have sustained serious or life-threatening injury or illness, during the performance of duty, shall be processed for retirement or assigned non-police duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Injured Metropolitan Police Officer Relief Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22CouncilLaw Number L22-0099 Effective from June 5, 2018
2018-04-23CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-04-13CouncilAct A22-0300 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3766
2018-04-02CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0300
2018-04-02CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0300
2018-03-22CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 5, 2018
2018-03-06CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-02-06CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-01-18CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-01-18CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0287
2017-12-07CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-03CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-05-19CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0287 Published in the DC Register
2017-05-16CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-05-16CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback