DC B22-0279 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Law Number L22-0034 Effective from December 13, 2017, Projected Law Date is December 9, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Law Number L22-0034 Effective from December 13, 2017, Projected Law Date is December 9, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-34 revises and increases the rates of the assessments in the Capitol Riverfront Business Improvement District.
Title
Capitol Riverfront Business Improvement District Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-22 | Council | Law Number L22-0034 Effective from December 13, 2017, Projected Law Date is December 9, 2017 |
2017-10-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is December 9, 2017 |
2017-10-27 | Council | Act A22-0153 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10758 |
2017-10-23 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0153 |
2017-10-23 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0153 |
2017-10-06 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 23, 2017 |
2017-10-03 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-07-11 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-07-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-07-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0279 |
2017-06-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2017-05-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0279 Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |