DC B22-0277 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Act A22-0102, Expires on October 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6717
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Act A22-0102, Expires on October 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6717
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approval Of The Transfer Of Control Of Open Video System Franchisee Starpower Communications, L.l.c. And Open Video System From Yankee Cable Partners, L.l.c. To Radiate Holdings, L.p. Emergency Act Of 2017
Title
Approval Of The Transfer Of Control Of Open Video System Franchisee Starpower Communications, L.l.c. And Open Video System From Yankee Cable Partners, L.l.c. To Radiate Holdings, L.p. Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Council | Act A22-0102, Expires on October 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6717 |
2017-07-13 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0102 |
2017-07-13 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0102 |
2017-07-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 21, 2017 |
2017-06-27 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-05-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-04-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |