DC B22-0275 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes a Rodent Control Fund for inspection, enforcement, or mitigation of rodent control violations. It requires those applying for a basic business license that requires a Public Health Food Establishment Retail endorsement, to include a rodent prevention plan approved by the Department of Health. The plan shall include plans to rodent-proof the property as defined by the legislation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making Rodent Syndicates Flee Restaurants, Interior Settings, Basements And Yards Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-10-27CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-05-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0275 Published in the DC Register
2017-05-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2017-05-02CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback