DC B22-0273 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes a program, the Common Interest Community Remedial Grant program, to provide nontaxable grants to income-eligible boards to remedy building and housing code violations in common areas. The Mayor shall administer the program and is authorized to issue rules to implement the bill. The bill includes provisions pertaining to eligibility requirements for participating contractors and common interest communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Common Interest Communities Remedial Funding Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-16CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-10-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-08-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-05-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0273 Published in the DC Register
2017-05-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2017-05-02CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback